Ayyadurai v. Floor64, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | F Dennis Saylor, IV |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-10011 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2017 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Leigh Beadon
Floor64, Inc. 370 Convention Way
Redwood, CA 94063 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Floor64, Inc.
370 Convention Way
Redwood, CA 94063 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael David Masnick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Shiva Ayyadurai
Cornell Dolan, P.C. One International Place Suite 1400
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
1. | TechDirt Will Fight 'Inventor of Email' Lawsuit (fortune.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/12/2017 | |
2. | 'Inventor of Email' Slaps Tech Site With $15M Libel Suit for Mocking His Claim (fortune.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/12/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
57 | 57
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 05/17 7:03 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to53 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick, Leigh Beadon,50 Notice of Appeal filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. Appeal50 ,53 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) |
|
56 | 56
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 05/17 7:03 AM
USCA Judgment as to53 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick, Leigh Beadon,50 Notice of Appeal filed by Shiva Ayyadurai (Paine, Matthew) |