California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:17-bk-10019
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017

Debtor
TAAC, Inc.
11150 Sepulveda Blvd Ste 2A
Mission Hills, CA 91345-1128
Represented By
David S Hagen
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nancy J Zamora (TR)
U.S. Bank Tower 633 West 5th Street, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/05/2017 12:01 AM PST
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 1:22 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1:17-bk-10019) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43981522. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 1:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by TAAC, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/18/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/18/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/18/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/18/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/18/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/18/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/18/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/18/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/18/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/18/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/18/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/18/2017. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 01/18/2017. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 01/18/2017. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 01/18/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/18/2017. (Hagen, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Wed 1:21 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (Hagen, David)
Related: [-]