M Development & Design, Inc
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barry Russell |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10113 |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2018 |
Debtor
M Development & Design, Inc
828 S Main St
Los Angeles, CA 90014-2002 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Edward M Wolkowitz (TR)
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP 800 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1260
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/05/2017 12:01 AM PST |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Wed 01/04 4:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Kim, Jason) |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 01/04 4:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10113) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43984327. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 01/04 4:39 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by M Development & Design, Inc (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Wed 01/04 4:43 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor M Development & Design, Inc. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Wed 01/04 4:48 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor M Development & Design, Inc. (Kim, Jason) |