Praxis Project v. Coca-Cola Company et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00016 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2017 1:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
American Beverage Association
|
|
Defendant
Coca-Cola Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Praxis Project
|
Represented By
|
1. | Coca-Cola and ABA sued over misleading science (foodpolitics.com) |
Submitted Wed 01/11/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 02/23 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Praxis Project (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/06 7:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Praxis Project.. (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/03 10:33 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Benjamin Simon. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/03 10:31 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Maia Caplan Kats. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/03 8:05 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Benjamin Simon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11127533.) filed by Praxis Project. (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/03 8:03 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Maia Caplan Kats ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11127517.) filed by Praxis Project. (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/27 10:31 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Praxis Project. Service waived by Coca-Cola Company waiver sent on 1/27/2017, answer due 3/28/2017. (Simon, Matthew) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/27 10:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Praxis Project. Service waived by American Beverage Association waiver sent on 1/27/2017, answer due 3/28/2017. (Simon, Matthew) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 01/23 9:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/17 7:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Beverage Association, Coca-Cola Company. Filed byPraxis Project. (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/05 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to American Beverage Association. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/05 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Company. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/05 12:00 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 01/04 10:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/18/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/04 8:04 AM
Proposed Summons. (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/04 8:03 AM
Proposed Summons. (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/04 7:54 AM
COMPLAINT against American Beverage Association, Coca-Cola Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11046080.). Filed byPraxis Project. (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |