Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: William G Cobb
Case #: 3:17-cv-00008
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2017 2:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Tom Brown
Represented By
Christopher B Reich
Washoe County School District, Office Of The General Counsel
contact info
Brian M. Brown
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Sara K Almo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Neil A. Rombardo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Defendant
Steve Struzyk
Represented By
Christopher B Reich
Washoe County School District, Office Of The General Counsel
contact info
Brian M. Brown
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Sara K Almo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Neil A. Rombardo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Defendant
Washoe County School District
Represented By
Christopher B Reich
Washoe County School District, Office Of The General Counsel
contact info
Brian M. Brown
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Sara K Almo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Neil A. Rombardo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake T. Berger
Represented By
Terri Keyser-Cooper
Law Office Of Terri Keyser-Cooper
contact info
Plaintiff
Mateo L. Lemus
Represented By
Terri Keyser-Cooper
Law Office Of Terri Keyser-Cooper
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan S. Madison
Represented By
Terri Keyser-Cooper
Law Office Of Terri Keyser-Cooper
contact info

Docket last updated: 08/18/2017 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 06, 2017
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 5:30 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 7/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. in 5th floor chambers Crtrm Administrator: Dionna Negrete ; Pla Counsel: Terri Keyser-Cooper ; Def Counsel: Brian M. Brown ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 - 10:50 a.m. Counsel and parties are present. The Court attempts settlement negotiations with the parties in chambers. The parties are unable to reach a settlement at this time. IT IS ORDERED that this matter return to the normal litigation track. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DBN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 2:20 PM
NOTICE RE:21 Settlement Conference: Please be advised that the Settlement Conference scheduled for Thursday, 7/6/2017, at 9:00 a.m., will be held on the Fifth Floor in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. (no image attached) (KO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
21 21 order Order Scheduling Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Wed 11:42 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 09:00 A.M. in Courtroom to be determined before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. Settlement Conference Statements shall be received in chambers, 400 South Virginia Street, Suite 405, not later than 6/29/2017. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 06/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
20 20 minutes Status Conference Thu 5:19 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 6/8/2017 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden ; Pla Counsel: Terri Keyser-Cooper (Present) ; Def Counsel: Brian Brown (Telephonically) ; Recorder: FTR ; Recording start and end times: 9:58:01 a.m. - 10:09:04 a.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . The court is in receipt and has reviewed the parties' 16 joint case management report. The parties' 17 proposed discovery plan/scheduling order is APPROVED . The court tentatively schedules a settlement conference for Thursday, 7/6/2017, at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge McQuaid, Jr. The court directs counsel to confirm with Ms. Ogden whether the date and time is available for their clients and representatives. Counsel shall contact chambers on Friday, 6/9/2017, if there is a conflict with the date for the settlement conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules Thu 11:00 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KR)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 11:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No.17 Proposed Order. Discovery due by 11/1/2017. Motions due by 12/1/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
17 17 misc Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Wed 12:05 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District . (Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
16 16 misc Case Management Report Thu 5:06 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District. (Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
15 15 minord Minute Order Setting Hearing Wed 10:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 5/17/2017, setting Case Management Conference for 6/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically, dial 1-877-873-8017 , enter access code 3416460 , and enter security code 6817 approximately 5 minutes prior to the hearing. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 4:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 5:35 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/19/2017.(Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
12 12 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Mon 11:03 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No.5 Amended Complaint. Response/Answer due 5/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 05/01/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
11 11 motion Stipulation Fri 8:54 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re5 Amended Complaint ; by Defendants Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District. (Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian M. Brown on behalf of Defendants Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District. (Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 2:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Brown re ECF Nos.5 Amended Complaint and3 Summons Issued. Tom Brown served on 2/27/2017, answer due 3/20/2017. (KW)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mateo L. Lemus, Jake T. Berger, Bryan S. Madison re ECF Nos.5 Amended Complaint and3 Summons Issued. Steve Struzyk served on 2/27/2017, answer due 3/20/2017. (KW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
7 7 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Mon 2:19 PM
ORDER approving ECF No.6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint ECF No.5 . Response/Answer due 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 03/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Stipulation Mon 9:09 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendants Tom Brown, Steve Struzyk, Washoe County School District. (Rombardo, Neil)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 11, 2017
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 1:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mateo L. Lemus. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 5/12/2017.(Keyser-Cooper, Terri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
4 4 minord Minute Order Thu 10:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/5/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 8:08 AM
SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants re ECF No.1 Complaint. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 9:29 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Jake Berger. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Certificate of Interested Parties . (Keyser-Cooper, Terri)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 9:26 AM
COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4421843), filed by Jake Berger. Proof of service due by 4/4/2017.(Keyser-Cooper, Terri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Brown,
Att: 3 Summons Summons Struzyk,
Att: 4 Summons Summons School District
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 10:51 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
Related: [-]