Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:17-cv-00001
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Jan 07, 2017 1:53 AM MST
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
David Funk
Defendant
Funk Dairy Inc.
Defendant
Curtis Giles
Defendant
Jeremy L. Pittard Attorney at Law PLLC
Defendant
Jeremy L. Pittard
Defendant
Shoesole Farms Inc.
Plaintiff
Brenda Gastelum-Sierra
Represented By
Mario Martinez
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, Aplc
contact info
Edgar I Aguilasocho
contact info
Natalie Camacho Mendoza
Camacho Mendoza Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Cesar Martinez-Rodriguez
Represented By
Mario Martinez
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, Aplc
contact info
Edgar I Aguilasocho
contact info
Natalie Camacho Mendoza
Camacho Mendoza Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mayra Munoz-Lara
Represented By
Mario Martinez
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, Aplc
contact info
Edgar I Aguilasocho
contact info
Natalie Camacho Mendoza
Camacho Mendoza Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ricardo Neri-Camacho
Represented By
Mario Martinez
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, Aplc
contact info
Edgar I Aguilasocho
contact info
Natalie Camacho Mendoza
Camacho Mendoza Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie Ortiz-Garcia
Represented By
Mario Martinez
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, Aplc
contact info
Edgar I Aguilasocho
contact info
Natalie Camacho Mendoza
Camacho Mendoza Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Dalia Padilla-Lopez
Represented By
Mario Martinez
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, Aplc
contact info
Edgar I Aguilasocho
contact info
Natalie Camacho Mendoza
Camacho Mendoza Law
contact info


1. Dairy Official Says he Hasn't Seen Human Trafficking Lawsuit (agweb.com)
Submitted Tue 01/10/2017
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Neri-Camacho, Dalia Padilla-Lopez, Brenda Gastelum-Sierra, Leslie Ortiz-Garcia, Cesar Martinez-Rodriguez, Mayra Munoz-Lara. Curtis Giles served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/3/2017. (Camacho Mendoza, Natalie)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Neri-Camacho, Dalia Padilla-Lopez, Brenda Gastelum-Sierra, Leslie Ortiz-Garcia, Cesar Martinez-Rodriguez, Mayra Munoz-Lara. Jeremy L. Pittard Attorney at Law PLLC served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017; Jeremy L. Pittard served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017. (Camacho Mendoza, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10:18 AM
Summons Issued as to David Funk, Funk Dairy Inc., Curtis Giles, Jeremy L. Pittard Attorney at Law PLLC, Jeremy L. Pittard, and Shoesole Farms Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Funk Summons,
Att: 2 Pittard Summons
4 4 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Thu 8:12 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Mario Martinez and3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Edgar I Aguilasocho for Brenda Gastelum-Sierra, Cesar Martinez-Rodriguez, Mayra Munoz-Lara, Ricardo Neri-Camacho, Leslie Ortiz-Garcia, and Dalia Padilla-Lopez. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
3 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Edgar I. Aguilasocho. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1533051.)Natalie Camacho Mendoza appearing for Plaintiffs Brenda Gastelum-Sierra, Cesar Martinez-Rodriguez, Mayra Munoz-Lara, Ricardo Neri-Camacho, Leslie Ortiz-Garcia, Dalia Padilla-Lopez. Responses due by 1/27/2017 (Camacho Mendoza, Natalie)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1533050.)Natalie Camacho Mendoza appearing for Plaintiffs Brenda Gastelum-Sierra, Cesar Martinez-Rodriguez, Mayra Munoz-Lara, Ricardo Neri-Camacho, Leslie Ortiz-Garcia, Dalia Padilla-Lopez. Responses due by 1/27/2017 (Camacho Mendoza, Natalie)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1532870.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Camacho Mendoza, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons for Curtis Giles,
Att: 3 Summons for David Funk and as agent for Funk Dairy Inc. and Shoesole Farms Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons for Jeremy L. Pittard and as agent for Jeremy L. Pittard Attorney at Law PLLC