California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Neil W Bason
Case #: 2:17-bk-10161
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 08, 2017

Debtor
Lady Elegance, Inc; a Delaware corporation
2311 S 6th Ave
Arcadia, CA 91006-5318
Represented By
Lady Elegance, Inc; a Delaware corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard K Diamond (TR)
Danning, Gill, Diamond & Kollitz 1900 Avenue of Stars, 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/06/2017 12:01 AM PST
Thursday, January 05, 2017
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Thu 9:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20214852. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 2:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Lady Elegance, Inc; a Delaware corporation Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/19/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/19/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/19/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/19/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/19/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/19/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 1/19/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/19/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/19/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/19/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/19/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/19/2017. (Cowan, Sarah) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2017 (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Thu 2:09 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]