California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:17-bk-10167
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 10, 2017

Debtor
Shaanxi Gourmet, Inc.,
8518 Valley Blvd # B102
Rosemead, CA 91770-1685
Represented By
Robert S Altagen
Law Offices Of Robert S Altagen
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Timothy Yoo (TR)
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP 800 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1260
Los Angeles, CA 90017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/06/2017 12:02 AM PST
Thursday, January 05, 2017
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 2:59 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10167) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43991091. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 2:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Shaanxi Gourmet, Inc., Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/19/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/19/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/19/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/19/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/19/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/19/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/19/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 01/19/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 01/19/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/19/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/19/2017. (Altagen, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Thu 2:58 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Shaanxi Gourmet, Inc.,. (Altagen, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 3:55 PM
Adversary case 2:17-ap-01004. Notice of Removal of all parties and action under rule of bankruptcy procedure 9027; 28 USC Section 1452 by Shaanxi Gourmet, Inc.,. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Altagen, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Thu 3:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/10/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Altagen, Robert)
Related: [-]