California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:17-bk-10181
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 13, 2017

Debtor
Tensorsoft, Inc.
171 South Robles
Pasadena, CA 91101
Represented By
Walter Scott
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Wesley H Avery (TR)
758 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 210
Pasadena, CA 91101
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/06/2017 12:01 AM PST
Thursday, January 05, 2017
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 5:35 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10181) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43992828. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Thu 5:37 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/13/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Scott, Walter)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 5:34 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Tensorsoft, Inc. (Scott, Walter)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Thu 5:36 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Tensorsoft, Inc.. (Scott, Walter)
Related: [-]