California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:17-cv-00039
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:53(b) - Prelim & Perm Inj Relief & other Equitable Relief
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Last checked: Friday Jan 06, 2017 12:31 AM PST
Defendant
D-Link Corporation
Defendant
D-Link Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff
Federal Trade Commission
Represented By
Laura Berger
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Kevin Moriarty
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Cathlin Tully
Federal Trade Commission
contact info

Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM PST
Thursday, January 19, 2017
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 9:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
18 18 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 4:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Trade Commission..(Berger, Laura) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 2:44 PM
NOTICE by D-Link Systems, Inc. Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Wed 2:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by D-Link Systems, Inc. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12:35 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11076905.) Filing fee previously paid on January 17, 2017 filed by D-Link Systems, Inc..(McKenna, Kara) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 4:42 PM
First MOTION Rule 4(f)(3) Alternative Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 1/31/2017. Replies due by 2/7/2017.(Berger, Laura) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service
13 13 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 3:42 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byD-Link Systems, Inc..(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-] 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Att: 1 Declaration of William Brown,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 2:47 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11079156.) filed by D-Link Systems, Inc..(Pepson, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cert. of Good Standing
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Christine Hurtado on Behalf of D-Link Systems, Inc. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 11:42 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11078096.) filed by D-Link Systems, Inc..(Massari, Patrick) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
9 9 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 8:32 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission of Summons, Complaint, ECF Information, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference, and Standing Orders(Moriarty, Kevin) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service
Friday, January 06, 2017
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 2:54 PM
Summonses Issued as to D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 2:52 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Berger (Berger, Laura) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Moriarty (Moriarty, Kevin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 1:35 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Thu 10:19 AM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Federal Trade Commission.(Tully, Cathlin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Unredacted Complaint,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 9:09 AM
Proposed Summons. (Tully, Cathlin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 7:53 AM
COMPLAINT for injunctive relief against All Defendants. Filed byFederal Trade Commission.(Tully, Cathlin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet