California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:17-bk-10040
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 03, 2017

Debtor
Gary William Carrington, Jr
5844 Colfax Ave
North Hollywood, CA 91601-1028
Represented By
Gary William Carrington, Jr
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David Seror (TR)
21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/06/2017 12:02 PM PST
Friday, January 06, 2017
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 9:39 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Gary William Carrington Jr Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/20/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/20/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 1/20/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/20/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/20/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/20/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/20/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 1/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/20/2017. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 1/20/2017. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 1/20/2017. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 1/20/2017. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 1/20/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 1/20/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/20/2017. (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 9:42 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/03/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Fri 9:44 AM
Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Gary William Carrington Jr . (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion In forma pauperis (motion) Fri 9:45 AM
Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Gary William Carrington Jr (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]