M. Walter Roofing Acquisition Corp.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Donald R Cassling |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00407 |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Debtor
M. Walter Roofing Acquisition Corp.
219 William, Bensenville IL 60106
Bensenville, IL 60106 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Brenda Porter Helms, ESQ
The Helms Law Firm, P.C. 3400 West Lawrence
Chicago, IL 60625 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 01/07/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Fri 01/06 2:42 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $335, Filed by Richard H Fimoff on behalf of M. Walter Roofing Acquisition Corp. (Fimoff, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/06 2:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-00407 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33617510. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 01/06 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2017 at 01:00 PM at DuPage Courthouse, 505 N Cty Farm Road, Rm 2017, Wheaton, Illinois 60187. (admin, ) |