California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert N Kwan
Case #: 2:17-bk-10217
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 08, 2017

Debtor
American Global Freight, Inc.
235 N Toland Ave
West Covina, CA 91790-2354
Represented By
Lazaro E Fernandez
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard K Diamond (TR)
Danning, Gill, Diamond & Kollitz 1900 Avenue of Stars, 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/07/2017 12:02 AM PST
Friday, January 06, 2017
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 2:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10217) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43998516. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 2:00 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by American Global Freight, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/20/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/20/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/20/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/20/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/20/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/20/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/20/2017. Signature of Attorney on Petition (Form 101 or 201) due 01/20/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/20/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 01/20/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/20/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/20/2017. (Fernandez, Lazaro)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Fri 2:05 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor American Global Freight, Inc.. (Fernandez, Lazaro)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 2:07 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Fernandez, Lazaro)
Related: [-]