Camero v. Geico Casualty Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00051 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 1:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Geico Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hermie Camero
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 02/10 9:34 AM
ORDER Granting8 STIPULATION to Dismiss Second and Third Claims for Relief and Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Tue 02/07 12:11 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Dismiss Second and Third Claims for Relief and Remand by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Fri 01/20 9:20 AM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Fri 01/13 4:07 PM
MOTION to Stay Claims for Bad Faith by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Fri 01/13 4:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Sever/Bifurcate by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. Responses due by 1/27/2017. (Hansard, Wade) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 01/06 1:17 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Geico Casualty Company . (Hansard, Wade) |
|
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Fri 01/06 12:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, on 1/6/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/21/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 8:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by GEICO Casualty Company erroneously sued and served herein as GEICO Casualty Company a/k/a GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Brookshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company for GEICO Casualty Company erroneously sued and served herein as GEICO Casualty Company a/k/a GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc. added. . (Hansard, Wade) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Fri 01/06 8:52 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-16-747398-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4425705), filed by GEICO Casualty Company erroneously sued and served herein as GEICO Casualty Company a/k/a GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc..(Hansard, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 12:31 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM) |