Fung v. Concord Servicing, Corp et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00052 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle M. Fung
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Concord Servicing, Corp
Terminated: 02/27/2017
|
|
Defendant
FIA Card Services, National Association
Terminated: 02/15/2017
|
Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/02 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michelle M. Fung. AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 03/03 8:51 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/27 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michelle M. Fung. AS TO DEFENDANT CONCORD SERVICING, CORP ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 02/28 8:34 AM
Party Concord Servicing, Corp terminated pursuant to8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 02/15 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michelle M. Fung. AS TO DEFENDANT FIA CARD SERVICES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 02/15 10:19 AM
Party FIA Card Services, National Association terminated pursuant to7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. (DKJ) |
||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 01/27 1:27 PM
ORDER Granting5 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint due 3/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 01/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation
Thu 01/26 12:10 PM
FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re1 Complaint; filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Austin, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 01/11 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN MICHELLE M. FUNG AND FIA CARD SERVICES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION by Michelle M. Fung. (Krieger, David) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 3:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Concord Servicing, Corp, Equifax Information Services, LLC, FIA Card Services, National Association. (JM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 11:00 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Michelle M. Fung. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4426153), filed by Michelle M. Fung. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Concord Services, NA, | ||
Att: 3 Summons FIA, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Equifax | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 3:11 PM
Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM) |