Glover-Paige v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00054 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 1:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doris A. Glover-Paige
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Innovis Data Solutions, Inc
Terminated: 02/06/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/16 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; filed by Plaintiff Doris A. Glover-Paige. (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/17 8:23 AM
Party Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated per9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Civil Case terminated. (SLD) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 03/07 5:18 PM
NOTICE re: Settlement; filed by Doris A. Glover-Paige. (Krieger, David) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 02/17 12:53 PM
ORDER Granting5 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC's answer due 3/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Thu 02/16 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re5 Stipulation by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Austin, Bradley) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation
Thu 02/16 3:29 PM
FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re1 Complaint; filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Austin, Bradley) Corrected image 6 attached on 2/16/2017 (RFJ) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/06 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; filed by Plaintiff Doris A. Glover-Paige. (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 02/07 9:21 AM
Party Innovis Data Solutions, Inc terminated with prejudice per4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Innovis Data Solutions, Inc re1 Complaint.(SLD) |
|
Att: 1 Issued as to Innovis Data Solutions, Inc | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 11:38 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Doris A. Glover-Paige. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4426271), filed by Doris A. Glover-Paige. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Equifax, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Innovis | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 4:07 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) |