Cohen et al v. Berkley National Insurance Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00057 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Berkley National Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Stephen Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cohen Asset Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
1
pgs
appeal
Order on Mandate
Mon 08/12 3:54 PM
ORDER on Mandate as to46 USCA Mandate,41 Amended Notice of Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/12/2019. AFFIRMED (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/12 1:07 PM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, re45 USCA Memorandum AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to41 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Cohen Asset Management, Inc., Bradley Stephen Cohen. (MR) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 07/19 3:35 PM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to41 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Cohen Asset Management, Inc., Bradley Stephen Cohen. (MR) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
misc
QC Notice
Wed 07/03 4:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No.43 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Kirk A Pasich and Pamela M Woods are advised to review and update user account information. (no image attached) (EDS) |
|
43 | 43
notice
Notice Change of Address
Wed 07/03 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kirk Alan Pasich. (Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
Transcript Designation and Transcript Order Forms
Tue 07/03 7:41 AM
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for41 Amended Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . (TR) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Notice Appeal Amended
Mon 07/02 5:18 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to34 Notice of Appeal, by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. . E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Saturday, June 30, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 07/02 12:42 PM
ORDER that33 Motion to Amend/Correct the Order on the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Court's Order (ECF No.29 ), is clarified pursuant to the foregoing. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 12/04 5:18 PM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to34 Notice of Appeal filed by Cohen Asset Management, Inc. and Bradley Stephen Cohen. The motion to hold appellate proceedings in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of the pending motion is granted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
Transcript Designation
Fri 10/13 4:01 PM
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. re34 Notice of Appeal,. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. (Woods, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Non-Opposition
Tue 10/03 11:19 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to33 Motion to Amend/Correct, ; filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. (Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
appeal
Order for Time Schedule
Thu 09/28 5:17 PM
USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to34 Notice of Appeal filed by Cohen Asset Management, Inc., Bradley Stephen Cohen. USCA Case Number 17-16960 . (MR) |
|
35 | 35
appeal
Transcript Designation and Transcript Order forms
Thu 09/28 10:29 AM
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for34 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . (TR) |
|
34 | 34
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 09/28 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to29 Order on Motion to Dismiss,30 Clerk's Judgment by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-4792169. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 09/26 2:00 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct29 Order on Motion to Dismiss. PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Berkley National Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/10/2017.(Glancz, Gil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Court's 09/06/17 Order (ECF 29) | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Wed 09/13 11:29 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Substitute Attorney Gil Glancz for Defendant. Attorney Theodore J. Kurtz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 09/12 11:04 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Berkley National Insurance Company. (Glancz, Gil) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 09/07 7:51 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Berkley National Insurance Company against Cohen Asset Management, Inc., Bradley Stephen Cohen. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 09/07 7:47 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 08/29 2:21 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2017 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia ; Pla Counsel: Pamela Woods and Robert Mitchell ; Def Counsel: Gil Glancz ; Recording start and end times: 1:32p.m. - 1:54p.m. ; Courtroom: 3A ; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 23 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of 15 Defendant's Dispositive Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies the 23 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of 15 Defendants Dispositive Motion to Dismiss. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/18 9:25 AM
REPLY to Response to23 Motion to Stay filed by Defendant Berkley National Insurance Company. (Kurtz, Theodore) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 08/08 10:26 AM
RESPONSE to23 Motion to Stay, filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. Replies due by 8/15/2017.(Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Pamela M. Woods, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 to Woods Declaration | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 08/03 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kirk Alan Pasich. (Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Wed 07/26 4:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 7/26/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy Hensel. RE: 23 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of 15 Defendant's Dispositive Motion to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, August 29, 2017 at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IH) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stay
Tue 07/25 1:39 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of the Defendant's Dispositive Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Berkley National Insurance Company. (Kurtz, Theodore) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Fri 05/19 2:48 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (JM) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 05/19 2:48 PM
ORDER granting20 STIPULATION re Discovery. Discovery due by 11/24/2017., Motions due by 12/26/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation re Discovery Matters
Fri 05/12 3:10 PM
STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER; SPECIAL SCHEDULING REVIEW REQUESTED by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. (Woods, Pamela) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order for Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Fri 05/05 10:50 AM
ORDER that the pro se plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney shall submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order pursuant to LR 26-1. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 03/20 3:32 PM
REPLY to Response to15 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Defendant Berkley National Insurance Company.(Kurtz, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - EOF 320 P. 67, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - EOF 320 P. 68, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - EOF 320 P. 68 | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/13 11:49 AM
RESPONSE to15 Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. Replies due by 3/20/2017. (Pasich, Kirk) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 02/27 4:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Berkley National Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkley Insurance Company for Berkley National Insurance Company added. . (Kurtz, Theodore) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Mon 02/27 4:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Berkley National Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/13/2017. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/13/2017.(Kurtz, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Verdict Form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Judgment on Jury Verdict, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - CGL Policy, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Umbrella Policy | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/31 8:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/19 2:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. re4 Summons Issued. Berkley National Insurance Company served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/3/2017. (Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/19 9:48 AM
ORDER granting8 Verified Petition for Permission for Kirk A. Pasich to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kevin S. Soderstrom. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/19 9:36 AM
ORDER granting9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela Woods for Bradley Stephen Cohen,Pamela Woods for Cohen Asset Management, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/18 9:15 AM
ORDER granting7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Robert D. Mitchell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kevin S. Soderstrom. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 01/12 5:14 PM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pamela M. Woods and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kevin S. Soderstrom (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4435375) filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. . (Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 01/12 5:12 PM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kirk A. Pasich and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kevin S. Soderstrom (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4435370) filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. . (Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 01/12 5:10 PM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Mitchell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kevin S. Soderstrom (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4435361) filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. . (Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 01/09 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
minord
Minute Order
Mon 01/09 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 1/9/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Berkley National Insurance Company. (JM) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP
Fri 01/06 2:38 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kirk A. Pasich, Robert D. Mitchell to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 2/20/2017. (no image attached) (JM) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Fri 01/06 2:09 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Berkley National Insurance Company , filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. (Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT for Breach of COntract against Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4426478), filed by Bradley Stephen Cohen, Cohen Asset Management, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Soderstrom, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 2:35 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM) |