Rzepecki v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00059 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 1:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ida M. Rzepecki
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Bank of America, National Association
Terminated: 03/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Bank of the West
Terminated: 03/23/2017
|
|
Defendant
Ditech Financial, LLC
Terminated: 01/10/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/16 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ida M. Rzepecki. AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/17 8:42 AM
Party Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated per12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Civil Case Terminated. (SLD) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/23 5:44 PM
ORDER Granting10 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/22 10:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Bank of the West by Plaintiff Ida M. Rzepecki. (Krieger, David) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/13 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Bank of America, National Association Only by Plaintiff Ida M. Rzepecki. (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 03/14 10:07 AM
Party Bank of America, National Association terminated with prejudice per9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Thu 02/23 8:20 AM
ORDER Granting7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint due 3/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation
Fri 02/17 11:29 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, ; by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Austin, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
minord
Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 02/14 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 2/14/2017. ( Settlement documents are due by 4/14/2017.) Plaintiff and Defendant Bank of America, National Association have filed a notice of settlement5 in this matter. IT IS ORDERED that by April 14, 2017, these parties must file a stipulated dismissal or submit to the court a joint status report outlining what issues are impeding settlement and how or if the court can assist. The joint status report must be submitted directly to the chambers of the Honorable C. W. Hoffman, Jr., at fax number (702) 464-5581. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THE REPORT TO THE CLERKS OFFICE OR E-FILE THE REPORT IN CM/ECF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 02/13 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Bank of America, NA by Ida M. Rzepecki. (Krieger, David) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/10 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ida M. Rzepecki. AS TO DEFENDANT DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 01/11 10:19 AM
Party Ditech Financial, LLC terminated with prejudice per4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Bank of America, National Association, Bank of the West, Ditech Financial, LLC, and Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Complaint. (SLD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 1:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Ida M. Rzepecki. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4426552), filed by Ida M. Rzepecki. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons BOA, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bank West, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Ditech, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Equifax | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 4:20 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD) |