Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada et al v. Hudson Insurance Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00067 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 1:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hudson Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case
Thu 06/22 6:29 PM
ORDER Granting13 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 06/22 4:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order to Dismiss without Prejudice by Defendant Hudson Insurance Company. (Faux, Leland) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Thu 06/15 2:37 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Interim Status Report by Defendant Hudson Insurance Company. (Faux, Leland) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 05/10 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Order (ECF No. 9) by Hudson Insurance Company re9 Scheduling Order,. (Faux, Leland) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Wed 04/26 11:35 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (JM) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 8/14/2017. Motions due by 9/13/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/13/2017. All motions or stipulations to extend discovery shall be received no later than 7/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 02/15 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Hudson Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Odyssey Re Holdings Corp for Hudson Insurance Company added. Defendant Hudson Insurance Company's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interest Parties . (Faux, Kurt) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/15 3:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, Hudson Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Hudson Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2017.(Faux, Kurt) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/23 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund, Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada re1 Complaint,,,3 Summons Issued. Hudson Insurance Company served on 1/11/2017, answer due 2/1/2017. (Ring, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Related Cases
Wed 01/11 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:15-cv-02129-APG-NJK; 2:16-cv-03003-JCM-CWH by Plaintiffs Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute. (Ring, Nathan) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Tue 01/10 8:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 1/10/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/09 8:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Hudson Insurance Company. (JM) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Ring, Nathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Hudson Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4427061), filed by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund, Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Ring, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 01/09 8:10 AM
Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM) |