West v. Boulder Dam Credit Union et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00068 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen L. West
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Boulder Dam Credit Union
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Terminated: 03/13/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/05 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Plaintiff Kathleen L. West. (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/06 8:17 AM
Civil Case Terminated per13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 06/02 10:08 AM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report on or before 6/30/17. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/16 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Boulder Dam Credit Union by Plaintiff Kathleen L. West. (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 03/17 8:30 AM
Party Boulder Dam Credit Union terminated per11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/13 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Kathleen L. West. (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 03/14 8:24 AM
Party Nationstar Mortgage, LLC terminated per10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR) |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 03/08 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Kathleen L. West. (Krieger, David) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 02/14 1:17 PM
ORDER Granting7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). Defendant Boulder Dam Credit Union's response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint due 3/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/13 3:24 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint by Defendant Boulder Dam Credit Union. (Larsen, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 01/27 3:15 PM
ORDER Granting5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer/Respond re1 COMPLAINT. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation
Thu 01/26 12:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Austin, Bradley) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Mon 01/09 8:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 1/9/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 4:17 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants re1 Complaint. (ADR) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Kathleen L. West. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4427066), filed by Kathleen L. West. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Boulder, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Nationstar, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Equifax | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 4:13 PM
Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) |