Gunn v. Wild
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00072 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Ninth Circuit, 18-15192 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 06, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hans-Peter Wild
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lezlie J. Gunn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
58 | 58
1
pgs
appeal
Order on Mandate
Fri 07/26 11:16 AM
ORDER on Mandate as to55 USCA Memorandum AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court re48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lezlie J. Gunn. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
56 | 56
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/24 11:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to55 USCA Memorandum. AFFIRMED (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |