Maranatha Enterprises, LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Michael G Williamson |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-00094 |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jan 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Debtor
Maranatha Enterprises, LLC
18821 Fairway Green Dr
Hudson, FL 34667-5726 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Larry S. Hyman
PO Box 18625
Tampa, FL 33679 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA7/13
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 01/09/2017 12:03 PM EST |