California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:17-bk-10171
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
TNC, Inc.
3700 Inland Empire Blvd Ste 150
Ontario, CA 91764-4949
Represented By
Stephen R Wade
The Law Offices Of Stephen R Wade
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Monday, January 16, 2017
11 11 notice Notice Mon 10:30 AM
Notice of Hearing on Status Conference of Chapter 11 Case and Service of Order: (1) Setting Scheduling Hearing and case Management Conference and (2) Requiring Status Report; with proof of service; Filed by Debtor TNC, Inc. Related [+]. (Wade, Stephen)
Related: [-] 4 Order (1) Setting Scheduling Hearing And Case Management Conference And (2) Requiring Status Report. Hearing Set For February 14, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 1/11/2017
Sunday, January 15, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, January 13, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
8 8 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 1:57 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/9/2017 at 02:30 PM at RM 720, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. (Eudy, Debra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TNC, Inc.
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TNC, Inc.
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10:57 AM
Hearing Set re Scheduling And Case Management Conference And (2) Requiring Status Report. Status hearing to be held on 2/14/2017 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (Cargill, Rita)
Related: [-]
4 4 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 10:54 AM
Order (1) Setting Scheduling Hearing And Case Management Conference And (2) Requiring Status Report. Hearing Set For February 14, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/11/2017 (Cargill, Rita)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, January 09, 2017
3 3 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Mon 11:46 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Re: Chapter 11 Petition - Document No. 1 ; Filed by Debtor TNC, Inc.. (Wade, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Mon 11:42 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor TNC, Inc.. (Wade, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11:42 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by TNC, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 01/23/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/23/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/23/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/23/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/23/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/23/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/23/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/23/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/23/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 01/23/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 01/23/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/23/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/23/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/23/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/23/2017. (Wade, Stephen)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 11:44 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:17-bk-10171) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44007354. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1