District Of Columbia Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:S Martin Teel, Jr
Case #: 1:17-bk-00012
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Vision Investment LLC
3601 Paul St
Alexandria, VA 22311-3725
Represented By
Suvita Chiman Melehy
Melehy & Associates, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/28/2017 12:00 PM EDT
Monday, March 20, 2017
42 42 misc Operating Report Mon 2:49 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 02/01/17 to 02/28/17 Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
41 41 misc Statement of No Alterations (LBR 1007-2(b)) Mon 5:50 PM
Statement of No Alterations - Local Official Form No. 12 (LBR 1007-2(b)) Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities Thu 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities with a Signed Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury or Show Cause Why Schedules Ought Not be Stricken. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order to File Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities.
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Statement of No Alterations, Amended Matrix or Show Cause Thu 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Statement of No Alterations, Supplemental Mailing Matrix or Show Cause Why Schedules Ought Not be Stricken. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Order to File Statement of No Alterations, Amended Matrix or Show Cause.
38 38 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities Wed 6:18 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Vision Investment LLC.(Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
37 37 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 6:02 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Fee) 17-00012 [misc,ammtrx] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number1961383. Fee Amount 31.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#31
Monday, March 06, 2017
36 36 order File Statement of No Alterations, Amended Matrix or Show Cause Mon 11:46 AM
Order to File Statement of No Alterations, Supplemental Mailing Matrix or Show Cause Why Schedules Ought Not be Stricken. Related [+] Order entered on 3/6/2017. Mailing Matrix due 3/13/2017. (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)31 Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Fee),33 Amended Schedules.
35 35 order File Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities Mon 11:44 AM
Order to File Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities with a Signed Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury or Show Cause Why Schedules Ought Not be Stricken. Related [+] Order entered on 3/6/2017. Statistical Summary and/or Summary of Schedules with Signed Declaration due 3/13/2017. (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)31 Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Fee).
Friday, March 03, 2017
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Fri 6:17 PM
Certificate of Service and Local Form 13 Filed by Vision Investment LLC. Related [+](Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:31 Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Fee),32 Statement of Financial Affairs.
Att: 1 Local Form 13
33 33 misc Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address Fri 5:53 PM
Amended Schedule Amended Matrix to Correct Address Only Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended) Fri 5:35 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati Fri 5:31 PM
Amended Schedules A/B, D. E/F and G No Creditors. Fee Amount $31 Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
30 30 misc Operating Report Thu 9:43 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 01/09/2017 - 01/31/2017 Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
29 29 notice Appearance (Add Party to Matrix) Sat 10:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request to Add Party to Mailing Matrix Filed by Maurice Belmont VerStandig on behalf of DP Capital LLC. (VerStandig, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
28 28 order Employ Fri 3:18 PM
Order Authorizing Employment Of The Law Firm Of Melehy & Associates Llc Melehy & Associates LLC Related [+] Entered on 2/24/2017. (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] :26
Saturday, February 04, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/04/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Consent Order
Friday, February 03, 2017
26 26 motion Employ Fri 9:18 AM
Application to Employ Suvita Melehy as Attorney for the Debtor as a Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Vision Investment LLC (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Declaration of Attorney
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 02, 2017
25 25 order Consent Order Thu 9:14 AM
Consent Order Conditioning Rights of Debtor(s) in Possession. Related [+] Order entered on 2/2/2017. (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)23 Motion to Condition Rights.
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
24 24 misc Verification Of Authority To File Wed 4:30 PM
Verification Of Authority To File Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
23 23 motion Condition Rights Tue 12:04 PM
Motion to Condition Rights Filed by U. S. Trustee for Region Four (Jones, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, January 28, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order to File Required Case Documents.
21 21 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended) Sat 2:32 PM
Amended Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 15,900.00 Filed by Vision Investment LLC. Related [+] (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:8 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor.
Thursday, January 26, 2017
20 20 order File Required Case Documents Thu 3:25 PM
Order to File Required Case Documents. Related [+] Order entered on 1/26/2017. (Lopez, Peter) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ENTERED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Modified on 1/26/2017 (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition.
19 19 order File Required Case Documents Thu 3:22 PM
Order to File Required Case Documents. Related [+] Order entered on 1/26/2017. (Lopez, Peter) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ENTERED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Modified on 1/26/2017 (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition.
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Statement of No Alterations, Amended Matrix or Show Cause Thu 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Statement of No Alterations, Supplemental Mailing Matrix or Show Cause Why Schedules Ought Not be Stricken. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order to File Statement of No Alterations, Amended Matrix or Show Cause.
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
17 17 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 1:44 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Fee) 17-00012 ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number1944384. Fee Amount 31.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#16
utility Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) Tue 1:41 PM
Fee Due Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Fee) $ 31 Related [+] (Ragland, Vamira)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Schedules
Monday, January 23, 2017
16 16 misc Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address Mon 4:04 PM
Amended Schedule Supplemental Matrix and List of Creditors Filed by Vision Investment LLC.(Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 13
15 15 order File Statement of No Alterations, Amended Matrix or Show Cause Mon 11:57 AM
Order to File Statement of No Alterations, Supplemental Mailing Matrix or Show Cause Why Schedules Ought Not be Stricken. Related [+] Order entered on 1/23/2017. Mailing Matrix due 1/30/2017. (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)14 Schedules A/B-J.
Friday, January 20, 2017
14 14 misc Schedules A/B-J Fri 7:16 PM
Schedules A/B-J Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Directing Debtor's Attorney to File Rule 2016(B) Statement
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deadline for Filing Required Docs Fri 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deadline for Filing Required Docs Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Deadline for Filing Required Documents
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Case Opening Fri 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors Fri 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Notice Generated and Sent to BNC
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Missing Documents Fri 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Missing Documents Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order to File Missing Documents
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
8 8 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended) Tue 11:50 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 15,900.00 Filed by Vision Investment LLC. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
7 7 court First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC Tue 11:43 AM
Meeting of Creditors Notice Generated and Sent to BNC (Wint, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 order File Fee Disclosure (Rule 2016(B)) Tue 11:22 AM
Order Directing Debtor's Attorney to File Rule 2016(B) Statement Related [+] Order entered on 1/10/2017.Attorney Fee Disclosure (2016(b)) due 1/24/2017 for1 , . (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] Related Document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition.
5 5 order Missing Documents Tue 11:10 AM
Order to File Missing Documents Order entered on 1/10/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/24/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/24/2017. (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficiency Letter - Case Opening Tue 11:08 AM
Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case. Related [+] Case Opening Deficiencies due by 1/17/2017 for1 , . (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
3 3 court Notice of Deadline for Filing Required Documents Tue 11:06 AM
Notice of Deadline for Filing Required Documents Related [+] Missing Case Opening Documents due by 1/23/2017 (Lopez, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
court First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 11:42 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/15/2017 at 03:00 PM U.S. Trustee's Meeting Room, Room 1207. Proofs of Claim due by 5/26/2017. (Wint, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 7:17 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-00012 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number1939992. Fee Amount 1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 7:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Vision Investment LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/9/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 05/9/2017. Schedule B due 01/23/2017. Schedule A/B due 01/23/2017. Schedule D due 01/23/2017. Schedule F due 01/23/2017. Schedule E/F due 01/23/2017. Schedule G due 01/23/2017. Schedule H due 01/23/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/23/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/23/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/10/2017. (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]