BYRON-MARASEK et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Peter G Sheridan |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00144 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff
JOAN BYRON-MARASEK
P.O. BOX 101
CLARKSBURG, NJ 08510 |
|
Plaintiff
JAN MARASEK
P.O. BOX 101
CLARKSBURG, NJ 08510 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT see document1 against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by JOAN BYRON-MARASEK, JAN MARASEK.(seb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order of Dismissal
Fri 02/03 10:48 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/2/2017. (seb) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minutes
Show Cause Hearing Telephone Conference
Mon 01/23 10:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone conference on emergent application to proceed in forma pauperis held on 1/18/2017. Ordered emergent application reserved. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application to Proceed IFP
Thu 01/12 4:48 PM
EMERGENT APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JOAN BYRON-MARASEK, JAN MARASEK. (mmh) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due
Mon 01/09 3:39 PM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (jem) |
|
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Mon 01/09 3:34 PM
Complaint Received.(jem) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |