Notting Hill, LLC v. Kornhauser
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy S Black |
Referred: | Stephanie K Bowman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00016 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 6:04 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Samuel Kornhauser
155 Jackson St. Ste. 1807
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
|
Counter Defendant
Notting Hill, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samuel Kornhauser
155 Jackson St. Ste. 1807
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
|
Plaintiff
Notting Hill, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Mon 09/25 2:55 PM
Letter to Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas. (gs) |
|
23 | 23
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 09/25 2:24 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming22 DECISION AND ENTRY. (gs) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Mon 09/25 2:20 PM
DECISION AND ENTRY Adopting17 the Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge; Overruling19 Defendant's Objections; Remanding This Case to State Court; and Terminating This Case From the Docket. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/22/17. (gs) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response (non motion)
Thu 06/01 7:29 PM
Response re19 Objection to Report and Recommendations,12 Preliminary Pretrial Order,,,17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Notting Hill, LLC DEFENDANT/ COUNTERCLAIMANTS REQUEST FOR CLARIFATION AND/OR CONFIRMATION REGARDING CONTINUING EFFECT OF SCHEDULING ORDER DATES IN LIGHT OF MAGISTRATES MAY 2, 2017 RECOMMENDATION AND REPORT REGARDING REMAND AND PENDING OBJECTION THERETO by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser, Counter Claimant Samuel Kornhauser. (Kornhauser, Samuel) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 4:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Notting Hill, LLC RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES MAY 2, 2017 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Plaintiff Notting Hill, LLC. (Hinegardner, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/17 1:01 PM
OBJECTION to17 Report and Recommendations DEFENDANT/ COUNTERCLAIMANTS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES MAY 2, 2017 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser, Counter Claimant Samuel Kornhauser. (Kornhauser, Samuel) |
|
misc
Notice of Corrective Docket Entry
Wed 05/17 11:56 AM
Notice of Correction re: 18 Objection (non motion), Document Filed as Incorrect Event, Attorney to Re-file Document (bjc) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Objection (non motion)
Tue 05/16 7:42 PM
Objection re17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Notting Hill, LLC DEFENDANT/ COUNTERCLAIMANTS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES MAY 2, 2017 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser, Counter Claimant Samuel Kornhauser. (Kornhauser, Samuel) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/02 8:56 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, IT IS RECOMMENDED that this case be remanded to state court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), without further consideration of the pending motion to dismiss certain counterclaims. Objections to R&R due by 5/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/2/2017. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
trial
Witness List
Mon 05/01 4:37 PM
Witness List by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser, Counter Claimant Samuel Kornhauser. (Kornhauser, Samuel) |
|
15 | 15
trial
Witness List
Mon 05/01 4:21 PM
Witness List by Plaintiff Notting Hill, LLC. (Hinegardner, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 03/07 4:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss OF PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF PLAINTIFF filed by Plaintiff Notting Hill, LLC. (Hinegardner, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/21 8:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss OF PLAINTIFF COUNTERCLAIMANT SAMUEL KORNHAUSER'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION DISMISS OF PLAINTIFF filed by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser, Counter Claimant Samuel Kornhauser. (Kornhauser, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 02/15 12:41 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Deadline to file motion to amend the pleadings and/or add parties set for 30 days after the Court rules on any motions relative to the pleadings. Deadline to file motions relative to the pleadings set for 5/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure and report of plaintiff experts set for 5/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure and report of defendant experts set for 5/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure and report of rebuttal experts set for 6/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure of lay witnesses set for 3/15/2017. Discovery deadline set for 7/1/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions set for 8/15/2017. The final pretrial and trial dates will be set on the calendar of Judge Black. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/15/2017. (km) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 02/15 12:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 2/15/2017. Attorney Charles Hinegardner appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Defendant Samuel Kornhauser appeared pro se. Calendar Order to follow. Parties to advise the Court if a mediation is desired. (km) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Telephone Conference
Thu 02/02 10:27 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2017 11:30 AM (Eastern Standard Time) before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Counsel shall call 1-888-363-4749 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The conference access code is 8651321 and the security code is 2010. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference unless otherwise instructed. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 02/01 1:18 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PARTIES by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser, Counter Claimant Samuel Kornhauser. (Kornhauser, Samuel) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Mon 01/30 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss OF PLAINTIFF by Plaintiff Notting Hill, LLC. (Burr, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Deadline
Wed 01/11 2:59 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/9/2017. (sct) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/11 2:38 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/11/17. (sct) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/10 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to William Skillman III. (eh) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Response (non motion)
Mon 01/09 4:45 PM
Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser. (eh) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 01/09 4:44 PM
MOTION to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights by Defendant Samuel Kornhauser. (eh) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 01/09 4:43 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Notting Hill, LLC filed by Samuel Kornhauser. (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. 1-6 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 12/9/2016 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1606763) by Notting Hill, LLC against Samuel Kornhauser. (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. A-C | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 01/09 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Samuel Kornhauser from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1606763. (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Group Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Filing Fee Receipt | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 01/09 4:39 PM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN030403 (eh) |