Fambrough-McCoy v. White Castle System, Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan J Dlott |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00019 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
White Castle System, Inc.
555 West Goodale St.
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachael Fambrough-McCoy
6820 Bake Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45239 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 07/20 1:06 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of White Castle System, Inc. against Rachael Fambrough-McCoy. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/20/17. (wam) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/20 1:05 PM
ORDER granting7 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Doc. 7) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs federal age (Count One) and disability (Count Two) discrimination claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, but her state age (Count Three) and disability (Count Four) discrimination claims, brought pursuant to Ohio Rev. Code §§ 4112.14, 4112.99 and §§ 4112.02(A), 4112.99 respectively, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/20/17. (wam) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 07/11 11:24 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Defendant White Castle System, Inc.. (Burke, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 06/22 2:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant White Castle System, Inc.. (Burke, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/08 9:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Rachael Fambrough-McCoy. (Hordes, Donald) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/19 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (vp) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/18 4:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant White Castle System, Inc.. (Burke, Rachel) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/18 4:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support by Defendant White Castle System, Inc.. (Burke, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/17 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Catherine Reichwein for Defendant White Castle System, Inc. |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/21 10:35 AM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant White Castle System, Inc. to Move or Plead by Defendant White Castle System, Inc.. (Burke, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/13 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant White Castle System, Inc.. White Castle System, Inc. served on 4/6/2017, answer due 4/27/2017. (jlw) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Tue 04/04 10:30 AM
Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re1 COMPLAINT and2 Summons Issued. (eh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/04 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to White Castle System, Inc. (eh) Modified on 4/4/2017 (eh) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 01/10 1:05 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against White Castle System, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5792626), filed by Rachael Fambrough-McCoy. (Hordes, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |