Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. Montgomery et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00020 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 15:717 Natural Gas Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Susan L Geer
6334 County Road 1
South Point, OH 45680 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Montgomery
505 Brubaker Drive
South Point, OH 45680 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pamela Montgomery
505 Brubaker Drive
South Point, OH 45680 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
2.6 acres of Land, more or less, In Lawrence County, Ohio
|
|
Defendant
Cora Hall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jerry Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
1700 MacCorkle Avenue, S.E.
Charleston, WV 25325 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/16 5:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal , with Prejudice, of Defendants George Montgomery and Pamela Montgomery by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/05 4:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal , with Prejudice, of Defendants Cora A. Hall and Jerry D. Hall, Deceased by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/16 9:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; case maybe reopened by remaining defendants G. and P. Montgomery and C. Hall by 9/16/19; counsel will file a dismissal regarding C. Hall on or before 9/5/19 and G. and P. Montgomery on or before 9/16/19. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/16/19. (ba) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/15 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that a Status Conference is set for 8/15/2019 at 03:30 PM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 7/29/19 for conferencing instructions (ba) |
||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/15 3:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 8/15/2019; Adam Smith appeared for plaintiff; Randall Lambert appeared for defendants; matter is reported to be resolved; a 30-day conditional dismissal to follow. (ba) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
12
pgs
motion
Order to
Mon 08/12 3:45 PM
MOTION for Order to Enforce This Courts July 31, 2019 Order by Excluding the Testimony of Kirby Milem and James Chattin and Motion for Telephone Conference with the Court on Tuesday, August 13, 2019 or Wednesday, August 14, 2019 by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Montgomerys' Amended Responses, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit milem witness.PDF, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit chattin expert.PDF | ||
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 08/05 4:47 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Stephen Kandra III | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/31 12:39 PM
ORDER regarding Montgomerys expert written report, fact and expert witness depositions and settlement as to Mrs. Hall; motion deadline for fees 8/5/19; appropriate Stipulation of Dismissal to be filed on or before 9/6/19. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/31/19. (ba) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Montgomery's Responses to Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Propounded Upon George and Pamela Montgomery, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's Motion for Sanctions or, in the alternative, Motion to Compel Defendants George and Pamela Montgomery to Provide Responses and Documents to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 07/30 11:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 7/30/2019; Adam Smith appeared for Plaintiff; Randall Lambert appeared for Defendants; plaintiff will forward by email to barrett_chambers@ohsd.uscourts the material discussed; the Court will review and followup. (ba) |
||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/21 1:41 PM
NOTICE by Special Master Emily T. Supinger Agreed Schedule (Supinger, Emily) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order to
Tue 04/16 7:43 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Order to Appoint a Commission to Hear the Remaining Compensation Issue Relative to Defendants Jerry and Cora Hall and George and Pamela Montgomery. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/16/19. (ba) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 12/14 11:48 AM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Settlement Conference held on 12/13/18; Adam Smith appeared with Matt Mancuso, Jonathan Scullion, and Shaun van Horn for Plaintiff; Randall Lambert appeared with Defendants George Montgomery and Cora Hall; the matter was not settled; order to follow regarding Plaintiff's pending15 Motion for an Order to Appoint Commission to Hear Remaining Compensation Issue. (ba) |
||
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 10/30 7:30 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that the Settlement Conference set for 8/21/18 is RESET to 12/13/2018 at 02:30 PM and remains set in Chambers, Room 239, before Judge Michael R. Barrett; parties shall provide the Court with a limited 5-page exparte position statement which shall be emailed to the Court at barrett_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov no later than 12/5/18. The Court will conduct exparte conferences prior to the scheduled settlement conference. Unless prior arrangements have been discussed with the Court, party representatives with complete settlement authority must be present throughout the conference. (ba) |
||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/02 10:29 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - Please be aware the settlement conference set for 8/21/18 is VACATED at this time subject to being reset to a date to be determined. (ba) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 05/29 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that a Settlement Conference is set for 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 239, before Judge Michael R. Barrett; parties shall provide the Court with a limited 5-page exparte position statement which shall be emailed to the Court at barrett_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov no later than 8/14/18. The Court will conduct exparte conferences prior to the scheduled settlement conference. Unless prior arrangements have been discussed with the Court, party representatives with complete settlement authority must be present throughout the conference. (ba) |
||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 05/01 12:40 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting19 Motion to Continue. The Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2018 is VACATED and will be rescheduled. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/1/2018. (mr) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Continue
Wed 04/25 4:30 PM
MOTION to Continue Mediation set for May 3, 2018 by Defendants Cora Hall, Jerry Hall, George Montgomery, Pamela Montgomery. (Lambert, Randall) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/17 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that a Settlement Conference is set for 5/3/2018 at 02:00 PM in Chambers, Room 239, before Judge Michael R. Barrett; parties shall provide the Court with a limited 5-page exparte position statement which shall be emailed to the Court at barrett_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov no later than 4/26/18. The Court will conduct exparte conferences prior to the scheduled settlement conference. Unless prior arrangements have been discussed with the Court, party representatives with complete settlement authority must be present throughout the conference. (ba) |
||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/06 10:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal , with Prejudice, of Defendant Susan Geer Only by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 10/17 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Randall Lee Lambert substituting for Richard Meyers as to Defendants George Montgomery, Pamela Montgomery. (Lambert, Randall) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 10/16 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Randall Lee Lambert substituting for Micah Kamrass as to Defendants Cora Hall, Jerry Hall. (Lambert, Randall) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
motion
Order to
Wed 09/20 12:47 PM
MOTION for Order to Appoint Commission to Hear Remaining Compensation Issue Relative to Defendants Jerry and Cora Hall and George and Pamela Montgomery by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/15 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Evans O'Farrell for Defendant Susan L Geer (O'Farrell, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 05/04 6:25 PM
ORDER granting (12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint until 10/13/17. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/4/17. (ba) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 05/01 10:49 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/13/2017. by Defendant Jerry Hall. (Kamrass, Micah) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 02/13 4:01 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint for all Defendants until 5/5/17. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/13/17. (ba) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 02/07 1:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 5/5/2017. by Defendants Cora Hall, Jerry Hall. (Kamrass, Micah) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 02/01 2:11 PM
STIPULATED ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFF COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION, LLC AND DEFENDANTS GEORGE AND PAMELA MONTGOMERY AND SUSAN GEER. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/1/17. (ba) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 02/01 2:09 PM
STIPULATED ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFF COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION, LLC AND DEFENDANTS JERRY AND CORA HALL. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/1/17. (ba) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/26 10:07 AM
NOTICE re7 Notice of Appearance This document was filed without a certificate of service which is required pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct the filing use the Certificate of Service event found under Civil Events-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process and link the event to7 when prompted. (jlw) |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/25 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Micah E. Kamrass for Defendants Cora Hall, Jerry Hall (Kamrass, Micah) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/20 12:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 1/20/2017 re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; Matthew Rechner and Adam Smith appeared for Plaintiff; Richard Meyers appeared for Dfts Montgomery and Geer; Jerry Hall appeared on his own; parties are at an impasse regarding the circulated agreed order on access and use; a hearing re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 1/27/17 at 10:30 am, Courtroom 109, Potter Stewart United States Courthouse, 100 East Fifth Street, Cincinnati, Ohio 45202; (notice of this hearing has been sent electronically to those registered to receive electronic notice and to Jerry Hall by regular US mail to an address listed in the record). (ba) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 7:36 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Service of Process on Defendants George and Pamela Montgomery, Jerry and Cora Hall, and Susan Geer (Smith, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Hicks Service Affidavit for the Montgomerys, | ||
Att: 2 Hicks Service Affidavit for the Halls, | ||
Att: 3 Transmittal Letter to the Halls and Federal Express Tracking Confirmation, | ||
Att: 4 Hicks Service Affidavit for Geer, | ||
Att: 5 Email Correspondence to Geer's Counsel | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/17 2:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 1/17/2017 re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining; Adam Smith and Matthew Rechner appeared for Plaintiff; Richard Meyers appeared for Defendants Montgomery and Geer; Dft Hall to porceed pro se; the parties will circulate and agreed order regarding access and use and follow up with the Court on 1/20/2017 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 1/10/2017 for conferencing instructions (ba) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/13 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 1/13/2017 with Law Clerk re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; Adam Smith and Matthew Rechner appeared for Plaintiff; Richard Meyers appeared for all Defendants; Meyers appeared but has not been retained; some Defendants may choose to proceed pro se; Status Conference continued to 1/17/2017 at 01:30 PM and remains set by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 1/10/17 for conferencing instructions (ba) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/11 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re Notice of Telephone Conference,,, of Compliance with Loc.R. 65.1(a) and the Court's January 10, 2017 Notice (Smith, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Correspondence to the Montgomerys, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Correspondence to the Halls, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Correspondence to Geer | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 01/10 12:56 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/09 6:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group, Inc., TransCanada Corporation, Columbia Pipeline Partners, LP, TransCanada Pipelines, LP identifying Corporate Parent Columbia Pipeline Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransCanada Corporation, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Partners, LP, Other Affiliate TransCanada Pipelines, LP for Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.. (Smith, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/09 6:09 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Condemnation Action Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 71.1(d) (Smith, Adam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Mon 01/09 6:06 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 1/30/2017) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's Motion for Condemnation Order, and Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Access and Use, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 5:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Susan L Geer, Cora A Hall, Jerry D Hall, George Montgomery, Pamela Montgomery ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5792669), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Blanket FERC Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Montgomery Certificate of Transfer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Montgomery Deed, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Montgomery Deed, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Hall Deed, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Geer Deed, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Montgomery Easement, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Hall Easement, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Geer Easement, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit FERC Environmental Assessment Report, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Blanket Authorization Notice, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Access Road Easement, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Montgomery Temporary/Additional Temporary Work Space Easement, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Hall Temporary/Additional Temporary Work Space Easement, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Geer Temporary/Additional Temporary Work Space Easement, | ||
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet |