Jabr et al v. Ohio Attorney General et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00018 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Christopher Bagi
|
|
Defendant
Department of Job and Family Services
|
|
Defendant
Department of Taxation
|
|
Defendant
James Dinsmore
|
|
Defendant
Ohio Attorney General
|
|
Defendant
John Reichly
|
|
Plaintiff
Eman Judieh Jabr
793 S. Burgess Ave.
Columbus, OH 43204 |
|
Plaintiff
Tareq Jabr
793 S. Burgess Ave.
Columbus, OH 43204 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 12/07 4:56 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail7 and8 sent to Eman Judieh Jabr certified (7009 2820 0003 5801 4315) was returned unclaimed. (jlk) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Wed 11/08 3:45 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,8 Clerk's Judgment sent via certified mail 7009 2820 0003 5801 4308. (jlk) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 10/30 5:29 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/30/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Mon 10/30 5:25 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; OVERRULING Plaintiff's Objections. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/30/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Hearing
Mon 10/23 5:51 PM
MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Tareq Jabr. (jlk) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default Judgment (Motion for)
Tue 03/28 3:21 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default and Default Judgment against Christopher Bagi, Department of Job and Family Services, Department of Taxation, James Dinsmore, Ohio Attorney General, John Reichly, filed by Plaintiff Tareq Jabr. (kdp) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 01/24 7:57 AM
OBJECTION to2 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Tareq Jabr. (er) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Eman Judieh Jabr & Tareq Jabr against Christopher Bagi, Department of Job and Family Services, Department of Taxation, James Dinsmore, Ohio Attorney General & John Reichly. (er) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement to Complaint | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 01/18 4:09 PM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Initial Screen: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/18/2017. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/09 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Eman Judieh Jabr & Tareq Jabr. (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: 3 summons & 3 Marshal forms). (er) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |