Brown v. Prince Gregory International Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | George C Smith |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00019 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 6:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Prince Gregory International Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Brown
5388 Winchester Cathedral Drive
Canal Winchester, OH 43110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 06/21 10:34 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Kenneth Brown. (Walton, Sean) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Status Report Order
Fri 06/08 4:36 PM
ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file a written REPORT ON OR BEFORE JUNE 22, 2018 detailing the status of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/8/2018. (kpt) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/04 2:53 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel Janay M. Stevens (Stevens, Janay) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/23 4:25 PM
ORDER: Dismissal entry or written REPORT detailing the status of this case due by 5/23/2018 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/23/2018. (kpt) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/12 4:47 PM
ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion to Cancel Mediation. The mediation, scheduled for March 12, 2018, is RESCHEDULED to April 18, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/12/2018. (kpt) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/09 12:22 PM
Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Cancel Mediation by Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc.. (Wall, Kirk) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
med
Notice Setting Mediation
Fri 02/23 12:54 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Mark Landes to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 3/12/2018 at 03:00 PM. (agm) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/14 1:42 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 2/21/2017 if case should not be set for March 2018 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/14/2018. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 10/25 11:41 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the March 2018 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 10/30/2017 . Motions to Amend and/or Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2017 . Primary Expert due by 3/12/2018 . Rebuttal Expert due by 4/12/2018 . Discovery due by 6/12/2018 . Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2018 . Plaintiff will make a settlement demand by 11/15/2017 , and Defendant will respond by 12/15/2017 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/25/2017. (kpt) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 10/27 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2017. (agm) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 10/17 9:54 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc.. (Stevens, Janay) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/17 9:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Prince Gregory International Inc., Quanta Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quanta Services, LLC for Prince Gregory International Inc... (Stevens, Janay) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/17 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2017 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/14 2:52 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Prince Gregory International Inc.. (Stevens, Janay) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/26 10:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Prince Gregory International Inc. answer now due 8/16/2017. (sem) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/25 9:36 AM
STIPULATION of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc.. (Stevens, Janay) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/25 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk M Wall for Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc. (Wall, Kirk) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/25 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Janay Marie Stevens for Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc. (Stevens, Janay) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/06 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Prince Gregory International Inc.. All Defendants. (Walton, Sean) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/03 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Prince Gregory International Inc.. (sem) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case
Sat 07/01 10:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/30/17. (jcw) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 06/29 2:29 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Walton, Sean) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Thu 06/22 12:40 PM
ORDER - If service of process on the defendant is not completed within fourteen days, this case will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/22/2017. (agm) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 05/18 11:56 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Kenneth Brown. (Walton, Sean) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/18 11:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean L Walton, Jr for Plaintiff Kenneth Brown (Walton, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Wed 05/03 5:05 PM
ORDER - The Court ORDERS that plaintiff show good cause within fourteen days why this action should not be dismissed and why an extension of time to effect service should be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/3/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Prince Gregory International Inc., filed by Kenneth Brown. (agm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 01/09 2:44 PM
Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 200COL045631. (agm) |