Draughon v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00020 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Petitioner
Mickey L. Draughon
|
|
Respondent
Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/02 9:36 AM
ORDER denying12 Motion for Leave to Appeal; denying as moot14 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying18 Motion for Relief. DIRECTS the Clerk to VACATE this Courts June 26, 2017 Order, ECF No. 13, which was also MOOTED when the Court of Appeals vacated the May 23, 2017, Order. DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/2/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/12 2:39 PM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (sct) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 12/22 3:59 PM
ORDER of USCA Accordingly, we DENY Draughons motion for leave to file a second or successive habeas petition as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Mickey L. Draughon Note: No Mandate to issue . (pb) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 08/09 12:06 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Mickey L. Draughon. (sct) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 07/18 10:21 AM
ORDER of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Mickey L. Draughon vacating the 5/23/17 order and remanding the case with instructions to dismiss Draughon's 3/27/17 motion for relief from the transfer order. Note: Mandate to issue. (sct) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/30 5:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (jlk) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 06/26 9:37 AM
ORDER denying re10 Notice of Appeal filed by Mickey L. Draughon. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/26/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to Appeal
Wed 06/21 9:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal Denial of Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (er) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 06/14 11:02 AM
USCA Case Number 17-3620 for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Mickey L. Draughon. Case Manager - Jeanine R. Hance. (sct) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 06/12 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (FILING FEE DUE) (er) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/23 10:00 AM
ORDER denying8 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/24/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/27 10:37 AM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) re7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (sct) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 02/17 3:16 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; OVERRULING Petitioner's Objection; TRANSFERRING this action to the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit as a successive petition. DENYING Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/17/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 02/13 11:13 AM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (sct) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 02/01 10:00 PM
Letter from Mickey L. Draughon. (er) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations Order
Tue 01/31 2:56 PM
ORDER - Denying2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mickey L. Draughon. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Recommending this action be transferred to the US Court of Appeals for authorization for filing as a successive petition. Objections to R&R due by 2/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/31/2017. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. Copies emailed to the Ohio AG as Ordered.) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 01/30 4:23 PM
Filing fee for habeas case: $ 5.00, receipt number 200COL045879. (er) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 01/10 4:38 PM
ORDER: Petitioner is directed to submit to the Court, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, either the requisite $5.00 filing fee or the application and affidavit by incarcerated person to proceed without prepayment of fees and a certified account from the prison cashier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/10/2017. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Att: 1 IFP form | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 01/09 4:40 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon. (sct) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Petitioner Mickey L. Draughon | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 01/09 4:38 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mickey L. Draughon. (sct) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |