Pruitt v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00086 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
R.L. Niello Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Pruitt
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 05 2017
MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California.CASE CLOSED.(Donati, J) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 04/16 11:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE remanding case to Sacramento County Superior Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Order granting Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix A | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/03 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steve Mikhov (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 01/09 2:14 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:16-cv-02970. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California.CASE CLOSED.(Donati, J) | |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Oswell, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2016 (Benson, A). | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Washington, S) | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2016 00203528 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., R.L. Niello Co., Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6829783)(Oswell, Laura) Modified on 12/21/2016 (Washington, S). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 6 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons |