Polese v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00087 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bob Baker Volkswagen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Joseph Polese
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Receipt
Thu 04/25 2:03 PM
Receipt from San Diego County Superior Court for remand documents. (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 04/11 2:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE remanding case to San Diego County Superior Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Order granting Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix A | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/03 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steve Mikhov (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 01/09 2:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:16-cv-03067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 Case transferred to the Northern California pursuant to MDL No. 2672, CTO-78. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of California*. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas) | |
Att: 1 CTO-78 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER Granting4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. The time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to January 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/1/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb) | |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal, by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Oswell, Laura) (knb). | |
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bob Baker Volkswagen, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. All related cases transferred out. (lrf) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Bob Baker Volkswagen, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (lrf) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2016 00041077-CU-FR-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9671618), filed by Bob Baker Volkswagen, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. The new case number is 3:16-cv-3067-BEN-AGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(lrf) (sjt). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |