Elsie Elena Iniguez v. Carolyn W. Colvin
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00093 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Plaintiff
Elsie Elena Iniguez
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment Terminate Civil Case
Fri 09/28 8:52 PM
JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated***. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/28/2018. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
27 | 27
38
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 09/28 8:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting 24 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Thu 02/15 3:35 PM
REPLY filed byElsie Elena Iniguez. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 2/15/2018) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/09 2:07 PM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying as moot 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in light of the filing of the Government's 24 cross-motion for summary judgment. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 02/02 2:03 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNancy A. Berryhill. (Talbert, Daniel) (Filed on 2/2/2018) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 01/26 4:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Talbert, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2018) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 11/20 2:13 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for a Sixty-Day Extension for Defendant to File Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Elsie Elena Iniguez, Nancy A. Berryhill. Cross Motions due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/17/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 11/15 10:36 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for a Sixty-Day Extension for Defendant to File Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Nancy A. Berryhill and Elsie Elena Iniguez. (Talbert, Daniel) (Filed on 11/15/2017) Modified on 11/15/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 10/27 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Daniel Paul Talbert (Talbert, Daniel) (Filed on 10/27/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 10/18 3:48 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 18 Stipulation to Extend. Responses due by 12/4/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 10/17 11:48 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Extension of Time filed by Nancy A. Berryhill and Elsie Elena Iniguez. (Na, Beatrice) (Filed on 10/17/2017) Modified on 10/17/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 09/20 4:46 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elsie Elena Iniguez. Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 11/1/2017. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 08/14 8:50 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Filing Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Elsie Elena Iniguez, Nancy A. Berryhill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/11/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 08/08 2:25 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Filing Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Elsie Elena Iniguez. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 8/8/2017) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
SSA Administrative Transcript
Mon 07/24 12:50 PM
SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Administrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 7/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Part 5, | ||
Att: 6 Part 6, | ||
Att: 7 Part 7, | ||
Att: 8 Part 8, | ||
Att: 9 Part 9, | ||
Att: 10 Part 10, | ||
Att: 11 Part 11, | ||
Att: 12 Part 12, | ||
Att: 13 Part 13, | ||
Att: 14 Part 14, | ||
Att: 15 Part 15, | ||
Att: 16 Part 16, | ||
Att: 17 Part 17, | ||
Att: 18 Part 18, | ||
Att: 19 Part 19, | ||
Att: 20 Part 20, | ||
Att: 21 Part 21, | ||
Att: 22 Part 22, | ||
Att: 23 Part 23, | ||
Att: 24 Part 24, | ||
Att: 25 Part 25, | ||
Att: 26 Part 26, | ||
Att: 27 Part 27, | ||
Att: 28 Part 28, | ||
Att: 29 Part 29 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/24 10:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byNancy A. Berryhill. (Na, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/24/2017) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/28 9:05 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill.. (Na, Beatrice) (Filed on 4/28/2017) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 04/24 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elsie Elena Iniguez (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/20 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/19 5:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 04/11 9:08 AM
Partial Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 44611014188. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Receipt
Mon 03/27 3:29 PM
Partial Filing Fee Receipt in the Amount of $100.00, Receipt No. 44611014021. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/26 3:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to pay $200.00 in two, equal installments. First $100.00 payment due 2/28/17. Second payment due 4/28/17. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Tue 01/10 10:46 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 01/09 12:29 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/23/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/09 10:30 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elsie E Iniguez.. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/09 10:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elsie E Iniguez. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin. Filed byElsie E Iniguez.(Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |