Arreola v. Colvin
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00095 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Tue 12/26 8:29 AM
JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Court's 12/26/2017 order granting Defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, the Court hereby ENTERS judgment in favor of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, and against Plaintiff Soccoro Arreola. The Clerk of Court shall close the file in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/26/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2017) |
|
24 | 24
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 12/26 8:25 AM
ORDER REGARDING 17 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 22 DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/26/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Wed 09/27 1:05 PM
REPLY filed bySoccoro Arreola. (Weathered, Tom) (Filed on 9/27/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 09/20 1:46 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 11/1/2017. (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 09/06 3:48 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 20 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/6/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 09/06 2:06 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Defendant's MSJ filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 08/09 9:12 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 18 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/9/2017. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/07 6:51 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Defendant's MSJ filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2017) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 07/10 6:37 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Soccoro Arreola. Responses due by 8/7/2017. Replies due by 8/21/2017. (Weathered, Tom) (Filed on 7/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
misc
SSA Administrative Transcript
Thu 06/15 12:06 PM
SSA Administrative Transcript by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Chamber's Copy) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
SSA Administrative Transcript
Mon 06/12 3:28 PM
SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Administrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 6/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Part 5, | ||
Att: 6 Part 6, | ||
Att: 7 Part 7, | ||
Att: 8 Part 8 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 2:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byNancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 6/12/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 04/19 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Kramer Marriott (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed in Social Security Cases
Tue 04/04 10:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by Nancy A. Berryhill. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/13/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 7:03 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill.. (Chen, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/20 3:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Soccoro Arreola as to United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice served on 3/6/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 02/23 5:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 USM-285, | ||
Att: 2 USM-285, | ||
Att: 3 USM-285 | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 02/21 11:25 AM
FURTHER ORDER GRANTING 3 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/21/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/25 12:08 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Soccoro Arreola.. (Weathered, Tom) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 01/24 3:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/7/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. Forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/24 3:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, granting ECF No. 3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/24/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Tue 01/10 10:40 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 01/09 4:17 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/23/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/09 3:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Soccoro Arreola. (Weathered, Tom) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/09 2:05 PM
***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD. COUNSEL WILL RESUBMIT CORRECT DOCUMENT*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Soccoro Arreola. (Weathered, Tom) (Filed on 1/9/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (sv, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin. Filed bySoccoro Arreola.(Weathered, Tom) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |