Mid-Century Insurance Company v. Smith et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00077 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle ( |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mister Jonathan Jackson III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anderson Moore
|
|
Defendant
James Anthony Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
Mid-Century Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Stay Order on Stipulation of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 01/20 11:01 AM
ORDER Granting6 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. All motions are Denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/19 12:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice and Order by Defendant Mister Jonathan Jackson III. (Roberts, Lindsy) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Mon 01/09 3:15 PM
MOTION to Stay re4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Stay Discovery by Defendant Mister Jonathan Jackson III. (Roberts, Lindsy) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 01/09 2:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Mister Jonathan Jackson III. Responses due by 1/23/2017.(Roberts, Lindsy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Patrick J. Wells | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 01/09 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Substitution by Mister Jonathan Jackson III re1 Petition for Removal,,.(Roberts, Lindsy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Certification of Scope of Employment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Mon 01/09 1:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 1/9/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/24/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Mon 01/09 11:23 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number 16C008044,, filed by Mister Jonathan Jackson III.(Roberts, Lindsy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. State Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. State Cross Claim / Third Party Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 01/09 1:46 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM) |