FLS TRANSPORTATION SERVICES (USA) INC. v. Casillas et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Valerie P Cooke |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00013 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Arlien Casillas
7635 Jasmine Court
Reno, NV 89506 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenRoad Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FLS Transportation Services (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
93 | 93
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/12 8:30 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.92 Stipulation for Dismissal of Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
92 | 92
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Fri 02/09 1:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Case, With Prejudice by Defendant OpenRoad Transportation, Inc.. |