Puget Soundkeeper Alliance v. APM Terminals Tacoma LLC
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-05016 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1365 Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
APM Terminals Tacoma LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
399 | 399
2
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Tue 09/05 12:03 PM
ORDER OF USCA 21-35881 21-35899 22-35061 as to394 Notice of Appeal, filed by SSA Marine, Inc., SSA Terminals (Tacoma) LLC, SSA Terminals LLC;368 Notice of Appeal, filed by Puget Soundkeeper Alliance;378 Notice of Appeal, filed by Port of Tacoma. Puget Soundkeeper Alliance and the Port of Tacoma are required to file simultaneous supplemental briefs addressing the three issues identified in the August 18, 2023 order. All other named parties may file supplemental briefs addressing those issues on the same schedule, and subject to the same length limits, as specified in the August 18, 2023 order. (MW) |