Redskins Grille 1, LLC
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Klinette H Kindred |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10102 |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Converted: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Redskins Grille 1, LLC
20376 Exchange St
Ashburn, VA 20147-5955 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Robert E. Burness
3 Miller Road
Newtown, PA 18940 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
H. Jason Gold
H. Jason Gold, Trustee 341 Dial 877-973-4749 Code: 9974082 P.O. Box 57359
Washington, DC 20037 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 115 South Union Street, Room 210
Alexandria, VA 22314 |
|
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 1725 Duke Street Suite 650
Alexandria, VA 22314 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee R4_CH7, VA
|
1. | Redskins-Themed Restaurant Hail & Hog Files for Chapter 11 (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 01/11/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 02/07/2024 1:48 PM EST |
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Tue 01/10 9:09 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Roy M. Terry Jr. of Sands Anderson PC on behalf of Redskins Grille 1, LLC. (Terry, Roy) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/10 5:48 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-10102 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 25437689, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |