California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:17-bk-10301
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Temple CB LLC
4350 Temple City Blvd
El Monte, CA 91731-1010
Represented By
J Thomas Hand
Hand & Hand
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 12:19 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Weber, Edward. (Weber, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Tue 10:16 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/13/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 5, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Case Deficiency (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (BNC)
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Temple CB LLC
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Wed 7:56 AM
Judge Barry Russell added to case due to related case 2:09-bk-19210-BR. Involvement of Judge Julia W. Brand Terminated (Fleming, Lachelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
2 2 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Tue 1:59 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (Serrano, Vera)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Temple CB LLC
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 1:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Temple CB LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 1/24/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/24/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/24/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/24/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/24/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/24/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/24/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/24/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/24/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/24/2017. (Serrano, Vera)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 9:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00 by 19. Receipt Number 20215048. (admin)
Related: [-]