United States of America v. Eastpointe, City of et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence G Berg |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-10079 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cardi DeMonaco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Duchane
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eastpointe City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eastpointe, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Klinefelt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sarah Lucido
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Marion
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suzanne Pixley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
1. | Department of Justice files lawsuit against Eastpointe over its electoral process (detroitnews.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/12/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 TRANSCRIPT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on April 18, 2017. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Nefertiti Jodi Matthews) (Number of Pages: 26) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through WWW.TRANSCRIPTORDERS.COM before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Matthews, N) | |
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/20/2017 -- SEE ADDITIONAL DATES IN ORDER, Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/12/2018 11:00 AM, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/16/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2018 02:00 PM, Bench Trial set for 7/9/2018 09:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) | |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Scheduling Conference held on 4/18/2017 (Court Reporter: Jodi Matthews) (AChu) | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/18/2017 01:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg. Scheduling conference will be held IN DETROIT, CONFERENCE ROOM 824. (AChu) | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Freeman, Daniel) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement Concerning Production Format | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
RESET HEARINGS: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/11/2017 03:30 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg. Scheduling conference will be held IN DETROIT, CONFERENCE ROOM 824. ***PLEASE NOTE LOCATION CHANGE*** (AChu) | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2017 04:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) | |
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Ihrie on behalf of All Defendants. (Ihrie, Robert) | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Answer to Complaint by All Defendants (Albright, Richard) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Albright on behalf of All Defendants. (Albright, Richard) | |
5 | 5 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Albright, Richard) | |
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Richardson, Jasmyn) | |
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jasmyn G. Richardson appearing on behalf of United States of America (Richardson, Jasmyn) | |
2 | 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luttrell Levingston appearing on behalf of United States of America (Levingston, Luttrell) | |
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra) | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 01/10 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Freeman, Daniel) |