Denhollander et al v. Michigan State University et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00029 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jul 06, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 25, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 09, 2018 8:44 PM EST |
defendant
Michigan State University
350 Administration Building
East Lansing, MI 48824 |
Represented By
|
defendant
Michigan State University Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Lawrence Gerard Nassar
|
|
defendant
Twistars USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
defendant
USA Gymnastics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane A.P. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Ste. 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane ALF-1 Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane B.A. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane B.M. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Ste. 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane BMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane CMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane DMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane EMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane FMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane GMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane H.B. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane H.H. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane H.T. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane HMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane IMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane J.S. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane JMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane KMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane L.A. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Suite 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane L.B. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Suite 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane L.K. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Suite 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane LMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane R.L. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane S.M. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Ste. 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane W.N. Doe
|
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Jane Y. Doe
White Law PLLC 2549 Jolly Road Ste. 340
Okemos, MI 48864 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
John AMSU Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Rachael Denhollander
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jessica Howard
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Sterling Riethman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lindsey Schuett
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A1 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A10 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A11 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A12 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A13 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A14 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A15 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A17 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A18 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A19 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A2 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A21 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A22 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A23 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A24 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A25 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A26 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A27 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A28 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A29 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A3 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A30 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A31 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A32 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A33 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A34 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A35 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A36 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A37 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A38 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A39 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A4 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A40 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A41 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A42 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A43 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A44 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A45 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A46 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A48 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A49 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A5 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A50 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A51 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A53 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A54 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A55 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A56 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A57 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A58 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A59 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A6 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A60 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A61 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A62 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A63 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A64 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A65 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A66 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A67 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A68 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A69 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A7 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A70 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A71 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A73 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A74 Doe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane A8 Doe
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
defendant
John Geddert
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
|
defendant
Kathie Klages
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Jeffrey R. Kovan
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Gary E. Stollak
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
defendant
William D. Strampel
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane B. Doe
Terminated: 07/06/2017
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane Q. Doe
Terminated: 08/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jane Z. Doe
Terminated: 08/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | 20 more women join sexual assault lawsuit against former MSU sports doctor Larry Nassar (freep.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/16/2017 | |
2. | 5 new defendants added to lawsuit against MSU doctor Larry Nassar (espn.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/09/2017 | |
3. | Judge allows 27 more women to join sexual assault lawsuit against Larry Nassar (freep.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/03/2017 | |
4. | 18 Women File Lawsuit Accusing Former MSU Doctor of Sexually Abusing Young Gymnasts (nytimes.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/12/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
1554 | 1554
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 03/30 6:53 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: final order of dismissal; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-HYJ-SJB et al. (aks) |
|
1553 | 1553
service
Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/30 3:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander for Sealed Document (1552 in 1:17-cv-00029-HYJ-SJB) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-HYJ-SJB et al. (Drew, Stephen) |
|
1552 | 1552
misc
Sealed Document
Thu 03/30 3:15 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT (Minor Settling Plaintiff's Probate Court Order) by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; filed under seal pursuant to order ECF 1542, 9/1/22, PageID.37795-37796 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-HYJ-SJB et al. (Drew, Stephen) |
|
1551 | 1551
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Thu 03/30 3:05 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-HYJ-SJB et al. (Drew, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
1550 | 1550
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/29 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney of Patrick J. Fitzgerald by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-HYJ-SJB et al. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) |