ONDINA-VIEIRA v. WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00151 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 5:05 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
WALMART STORES EAST, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
ABC-XYZ CORPORATION(S)
|
|
Cross Defendant
ABC-XYZ MASONRY AND GENERAL CONTRACTING AND SUB-CONTRACTING COMPANY(IES)
|
|
Cross Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOE(S), 1-50
|
|
Defendant
ABC-XYZ CORPORATION(S)
|
|
Defendant
ABC-XYZ MASONRY AND GENERAL CONTRACTING AND SUB-CONTRACTING COMPANY(IES)
|
|
Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOE(S), 1-50
|
|
Defendant
WALMART STORE #5142
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WALMART STORES EAST, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
arbtre
|
|
Plaintiff
MARIA ONDINA-VIEIRA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Thu 08/12 6:32 PM
Letter from the Clerk of Court, William T. Walsh. Counsel is directed to forward a copy of this letter to their client. (lr, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 07/10 4:33 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Case with prejduice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/10/2019. (km) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 11:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by WALMART STORE #5142, WALMART STORES EAST, L.P.. (DALLAVALLE, TIL) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 06/05 1:57 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 6/5/2019. (DS) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 06/05 8:59 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Settlement Conference held on 6/4/2019. (mm) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Appointing Arbitrator
Mon 05/06 2:21 PM
Order Appointing Arbitrator, RICHARD B. GELADE, ESQ. Arbitration Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in the Trenton Courthouse. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/6/2019. (jjq, ) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Oral Motion
Mon 05/06 11:54 AM
TEXT ORDER - This shall confirm that a Settlement Conference is set for June 4, 2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Parties with full settlement authority are required to be present at the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 03/08 2:52 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2019. (mm) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Oral Motion
Thu 03/07 8:55 AM
TEXT ORDER Please be advised that due to a court conflict, the telephone conference currently scheduled to take place on March 8, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. shall now take place on the same day, but at 10:00 a.m. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference as, well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Oral Motion
Tue 02/26 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER - Telephone set for March 8, 2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 02/07 9:45 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2019. Each party shall submit to the court electronically in Word format to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement memo, not to exceed 5 pages, with their respective settlement positions by February 20, 2019. Remaining schedule will thereafter be set. (mm) |
||
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/19 9:54 AM
LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff to serve any supplemental expert reports by 12/30/2018, Defendant to serve any supplemental expert reports by 1/30/2019, and Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2019. Plaintiff to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/16/2018. (km) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Oral Motion
Wed 11/07 10:17 AM
TEXT ORDER - The parties shall submit a joint proposed discovery schedule to the Court electronically in Word format to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 11/16/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Fri 11/02 10:47 AM
Letter from John H. Sanders, II. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 10/03 11:24 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 10/3/2018. No later than 10/26/2018 Plaintiff must seek leave to amend the complaint; the remaining schedule shall be set accordingly; in the meantime, the parties shall continue with production of medical reports. (mm) |
||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 07/31 3:31 PM
Letter ORDER advising the Court that the Defendant has completed the discovery deposition of the Plaintiff. Telephone Status Conference is set for 10/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 07/31/2018. (kas) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 06/25 10:53 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 6/22/2018. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 7/31/2018, with a written status update regarding the discovery deposition of Plaintiff. (mm) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Wed 06/13 5:02 PM
Letter from John H. Sanders, II, Esq.. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Wed 06/13 4:08 PM
Letter from John H. Sanders, II, Esq.. (SHEBELL, THOMAS) |
|
qc
QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer
Wed 06/13 4:56 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter submitted by Thomas Shebell on 6/13/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certification
Wed 04/25 4:24 PM
Certification of Maria Ondina-Vieira on behalf of MARIA ONDINA-VIEIRA. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 04/26 10:59 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2018. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 5/18/2018, with a written status update regarding production of medical information. Schedule for deposition of Plaintiff and IME shall thereafter be set. (mm) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Wed 04/04 3:43 PM
Letter from John H. Sanders, II. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/04 12:58 PM
LETTER ORDER resetting the 4/20/2018 Status Telephone Conference to 4/25/2018 at 1:30PM. Plaintiff to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/4/2018. (km) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Oral Motion
Tue 04/03 4:38 PM
TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for April 20, 2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Mon 04/02 5:37 PM
Letter from JACK SANDERS. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 02/23 11:12 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 2/23/2018. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3/30/2018, with a written status update regarding production of/certification regarding Plaintiffs medical records status of document production. (mm) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Oral Motion
Tue 02/13 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for February 23, 2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Thu 02/01 5:01 PM
Letter from John H. Sanders, II. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Wed 12/27 10:58 AM
Letter from John H. Sanders, II. (SANDERS, JOHN) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 11/14 4:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2017. No later than January 16, 2018, the parties are to provide an update regarding the production of Plaintiff's medical records from Portuguese medical providers. (eh, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/07 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIL JOSEPH DALLAVALLE on behalf of WALMART STORE #5142, WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. (DALLAVALLE, TIL) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Oral Motion
Tue 10/10 10:57 AM
TEXT ORDER - Telephone conference to address status of production of Plaintiff's medical records set for November 14, 2017 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 08/24 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 8/24/2017. No later than 9/8/2017, Plaintiff is to identify and provide HIPPA authorizations for any treatment she received in Portugal which was related to this incident; by 10/6/2017, the Defendant is to provide an update regarding collection of records from Plaintiffs treatment providers. The schedule shall thereafter be adjusted. (mm) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Oral Motion
Wed 08/02 11:11 AM
TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for August 24, 2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/10 3:39 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Mary L. Cooper no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/10/2017. (mps) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 06/30 8:50 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2017. No later than 7/31/2017 Plaintiff is to provide a update regarding production of medical records from Portuguese medical providers. (mm) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Oral Motion
Mon 06/05 10:58 AM
TEXT ORDER - Telephone Conference set for June 7, 2017, is hereby RESCHEDULED to June 29, 2017 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/09 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA TAVANO on behalf of WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. (TAVANO, MARIA) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Tue 04/04 6:05 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MARIA TAVANO terminated. Attorney MARIA TAVANO for WALMART STORE #5142 added.. (TAVANO, MARIA) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/20 12:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Plaintiff to initiate the call. Dispositive motions are reserved until after the Arbitration Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/20/2017. (km) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 03/20 1:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/20/2017. (mm) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 01/30 11:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC-XYZ CORPORATION(S), ABC-XYZ MASONRY AND GENERAL CONTRACTING AND SUB-CONTRACTING COMPANY(IES), JOHN/JANE DOE(S), 1-50 by WALMART STORES EAST, L.P..(TAVANO, MARIA) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 01/11 11:53 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (TAVANO, MARIA) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/11 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA TAVANO on behalf of WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. (TAVANO, MARIA) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 01/11 12:05 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WALMART STORE #5142, WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/30/2017. (km) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 01/10 3:45 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2017 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/10/2017. (km) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Tue 01/10 9:48 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jem) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/10 9:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORE #5142, WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. identifying WAL-MART STORES, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (jem) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/10 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART STORE #5142, WALMART STORES EAST, L.P. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MONMOUTH COUNTY, case number MON-L4197-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 7579165), filed by WALMART STORE #5142, WALMART STORES EAST, L.P..(jem) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |