Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Wynn et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy S Black |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00021 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
State of Ohio Department of Taxation
|
|
Defendant
Jason A. Wynn
2782 Westonridge Dr.
Cincinnati, OH 45239 |
|
Defendant
Roslyn S. Wynn
|
|
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
10851 Mastin, Suite 300
Overland Park, KS 66210 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Wed 01/11 3:12 PM
Letter to Hamilton County Clerk of Courts. (mr) |
|
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 01/11 3:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: ORDER (Doc.7 ) (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Wed 01/11 3:06 PM
ORDER: Mr. Wynn's petition for removal of a state court action to this federal court is DENIED; this matter is REMANDED to the state court; this matter is DISMISSED; an appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/11/2017. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/11 2:54 PM
State ANSWER filed in the Court of Common Pleas, Hamilton County, Ohio on 10/27/15 to5 Complaint filed by Jason A. Wynn, Roslyn S. Wynn. (mr) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 2:39 PM
State COMPLAINT filed in the Court of Common Pleas, Hamilton County, Ohio on 9/25/2015 against State of Ohio Department of Taxation, Jason A. Wynn, Roslyn S. Wynn filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (mr) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 01/11 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1505175 filed by Jason A. Wynn. (mr) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/11 11:00 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/11/2017. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 01/11 9:12 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/11/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/10 1:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Jason A. Wynn. (eh) (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal and Federal Stay of Foreclosure Proceding and Auction Sale Purusant to 28 USC 1446(a), | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Amended Answer and Counterclaim, | ||
Att: 5 Motion to Vacate Void Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 7 (1/10/2017) State Court Record |