Ligeralde v. Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William O Bertelsman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00024 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lexus a Division of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rica Ligeralde
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/18 2:53 PM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/18/17. (eh) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/17 2:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Defendants Lexus a Division of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Golden, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/18 11:44 AM
ORDER signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/18/17. IT IS ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the course of this litigation: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2017. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 9/15/2017. Defendant Primary Expert due by 11/15/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 1/29/2018. Discovery due by 2/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2018. Final Pretrial Conference: TBD. Trial: TBD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be, and is hereby, REFERRED to the Honorable Karen L. Litkovitz, United States Magistrate Judge, to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. (eh) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 04/07 11:04 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Of Parties by Plaintiff Rica Ligeralde. (Mullins, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/30 1:33 PM
ORDER granting14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David L. Ayers. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/30/17. (eh) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 12:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5897702) of David L. Ayers by Defendants Lexus a Division of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Golden, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Wed 03/22 2:58 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Remand to State Court and Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall confer no later than April 3, 2017 to consider the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/22/2017. (jlw) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/22 2:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/3/2017. (jlw) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/21 11:04 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Instanter filed by Plaintiff Rica Ligeralde. (Mullins, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/17 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Instanter by Defendants Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Golden, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 02/10 10:40 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Rica Ligeralde. (Mullins, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/03 11:00 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. re6 Corporate Disclosure Statement,7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Golden, Jason) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/03 10:40 AM
NOTICE by Clerk re6 Corporate Disclosure Statement and7 Corporate Disclosure Statement: documents filed without certificates of service as required pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct the filing, use the Certificate of Service event found under Civil Events-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process and link a certificate of service to the Corporate Disclosure Statements when prompted. (eh) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/02 3:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Golden, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/02 3:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc... (Golden, Jason) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/02 3:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc... (Golden, Jason) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 01/13 9:26 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Rica Ligeralde. (Mullins, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/11 8:23 AM
STATE COURT ANSWER to2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 10/27/2016. (jlw) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/11 8:22 AM
STATE COURT ANSWER to2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Lexus a Division of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 10/24/2016. (jlw) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 8:19 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Lexus a Division of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., filed by Rica Ligeralde. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 9/26/2016 as case number A1605311. (jlw) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 01/11 8:09 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/10 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1605311 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5794255), filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Lexus a Division of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc.. (Golden, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Summons & Complaint), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B (Answers), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C (Orders), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D (Discovery Responses), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E (Summary of Damages), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F (Medical Report), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G (Relevant Correspondence) |