Gunter v. Rankin
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Terence P Kemp |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00023 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jacob Rankin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony J Gunter
361 Killarney Drive
Pataskala, OH 43062 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 04/10 3:20 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the April 10, 2017 Order, the Court REMANDS this case to the Licking County Municipal Court Small Claims Division. (jk) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Mon 04/10 3:17 PM
ORDER - The Court REMANDS this case to the Licking County Municipal Court Small Claims Division. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/10/17. (jk) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Document
Fri 03/31 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Jacob Rankin re1 Notice of Removal, (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 02/23 11:18 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until 3/24/2017. In the event that no resolution is reached, defendant shall respond to10 Order to Show Cause by 3/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/23/2017. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay
Tue 02/21 4:00 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re10 Order by Defendant Jacob Rankin. (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 02/16 2:05 PM
ORDER - The Court directs defendant to show cause within seven days why this case should not be remanded to the Licking County Municipal Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/16/2017. (agm) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 02/03 11:41 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Anthony J Gunter. (Seasly, Steven) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/03 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Seasly for Plaintiff Anthony J Gunter (Seasly, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record
Wed 01/18 11:26 AM
State Court Record Received from Licking County Municipal Court. (mas) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/18 11:25 AM
Defendant Rankin's ANSWER to3 Complaint of Plaintiff Gunter filed by Jacob Rankin. (Contreras, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 01/17 4:04 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Jacob Rankin. (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Licking County Municipal Court on 12/2/2016 by Anthony J Gunter against Jacob Rankin. (er) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/10 12:25 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Jacob Rankin re1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/10 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Licking County Municipal, case number 16CVI00373 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5793608), filed by Jacob Rankin. (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Licking County Municipal Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |