Hammler v. Director of CDCR
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nandor J Vadas |
Referred: | Pslc Agb |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00097 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Defendant
AW Of Health Care
|
|
Defendant
Director of CDCR
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Striebel
|
|
Defendant
Warden of SVSP
|
|
Plaintiff
Allen Hammler
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Payment Record Card
Tue 08/27 2:48 PM
PAYMENT RECORD CARD : payment of Filing Fee in the amount of $350.00 paid on 2/8/19. (cfkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Thu 04/27 10:17 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/27/2017.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/27 9:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/27/2017.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thu 03/02 12:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 7 Motion for TRO; denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/02 11:49 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Att: 2 (3/2/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Temporary Restraining Order PSP Preliminary Injunction PSP
Wed 02/15 10:48 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allen Hammler. Responses due by 3/15/2017. Replies due by 3/29/2017.(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Thu 02/02 11:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Allen Hammler.(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/20 9:40 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allen Hammler..(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/10 11:32 AM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Tue 01/10 11:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/16/2017. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Tue 01/10 11:20 AM
Note To Clerk From Plaintiff regarding filing of Complaint and In Forma Pauperis (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/10 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee IFPP) PR. Filed byAllen Hammler. Consent/Declination due by 2/8/2017.(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |