HOQUE v. RACK ROOM SHOES, INC.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maria-Elena James |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00122 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rack Room Shoes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad Hoque
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
Richard Whitmore
Terminated: 05/17/2017
135 Main Street 7th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |