Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00082 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 2:19 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Housing and Urban Development
|
|
Cross Defendant
Eva Mijarez
|
|
Cross Defendant
Filimon Mijarez
|
|
Defendant
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Washburn Creek Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Absolute Collection Services, LLC
6440 Sky Pointe Drive 140 - 154
Las Vegas, NV 89131 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Washburn Creek Association
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
92 | 92
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/10 9:35 AM
ORDER Releasing Security Bond. The $500 deposit, plus interest, be refunded in accordance with the certificate of cash deposit, ECF No. 23. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
91 | 91
notice
Notice Other
Fri 03/06 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Release of Lis Pendens by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re5 Notice of Lis Pendens. (Riether, Robert) |
|
90 | 90
misc
Proposed Order Submission
Fri 03/06 11:01 AM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on14 Certificate of Cash Deposit by Counter Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Riether, Robert) |