Lezama v. Clark County
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00086 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap) |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Clark County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rolando Lezama
6299 Bold Regetta Court
Las Vegas, NV 89141 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
50 | 50
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 06/25 10:41 AM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to49 USCA Memorandum. AFFIRMED, REVERSED AND VACATED (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |